This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 12/31/2022 at 21:31:08 (UTC).

FORENSIC MINERALS INC V OWNERS ETAL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 FORENSIC MINERALS INC filed an Other lawsuit against OWNERS ETAL -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SUTTERFIELD, DENNIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-279

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SUTTERFIELD, DENNIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORENSIC MINERALS, INC.

Defendants

JABARA, LESLIE A

MORRISON, CRAIG J

SMITH, CHARLES EDWARD

ESTATE OF JOHN F. HAFNER

WYNN CROSBY PARTNERS I, LTD

HARPER, CHARLOTTE A

HARPER, ALLEN

THOMPSON CEMETERY

LEEMAN MINERALS, LLC

SMITH, SHEILA

MEGEARS, JOHN M

PAGE, JOSEPH

PAGE, MARY ALICE

RUDDER, TERRY

RUDDER, LONNA

DAUER, LACRICIA G

DAUER, GUTHRIE

DAUER, TRAVIS D

HAYS, TYLER

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STREETT, JAMES ALBERT

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

07/18/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

ORDER OTHER

07/18/2022: ORDER OTHER

WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

07/19/2022: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

08/04/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

EXHIBITS

08/24/2022: EXHIBITS

ORDER OTHER

08/24/2022: ORDER OTHER

ORDER OTHER

08/24/2022: ORDER OTHER

ORDER OTHER

10/13/2022: ORDER OTHER

AGREED ORDER

10/18/2022: AGREED ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED; Name: STREETT, JAMES ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AGREED ORDER; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: FINAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Name: STREETT, JAMES ALBERT; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: STREETT, JAMES ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: STREETT, JAMES ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: STREETT, JAMES ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,; Entry: ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE BY WARNING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 58CI2808.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: STREETT, JAMES ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: STREETT, JAMES ALBERT; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR IMPOSITION OF EQUITABLE LEIN AND FOR EQUITABLE QUIETING OF TITLE SUBJECT TO RIGHT OF REDEMPTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: STREETT, JAMES ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less