This case was last updated from Baxter County Courts on 01/20/2022 at 21:05:51 (UTC).

FIRST SECURITY BANK V JUSTIN KYLE CRAWFORD -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 FIRST SECURITY BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JUSTIN KYLE CRAWFORD -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Baxter County Courts, Baxter County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BAILEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-11

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Baxter, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST SECURITY BANK

Defendant

CRAWFORD, JUSTIN KYLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/13/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

AFFIDAVIT FILED

01/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE

01/25/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER

03/04/2021: JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: AGREED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE; Entry: SUMMONS SERVED (JUSTIN KYLE CRAWFORD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 03CI4932.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE; Entry: JUSTIN KYLE CRAWFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE; Entry: Servicemembers Civil Relief Act Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE; Entry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less