This case was last updated from Crittenden County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 06:21:22 (UTC).

FIRST PORTFOLIO VENTURE I LLC V LAQUINICA WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 FIRST PORTFOLIO VENTURE I LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LAQUINICA WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Crittenden County Courts, Crittenden County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LUSBY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-151

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Crittenden, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

LUSBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST PORTFOLIO VENTURES I LLC

Defendant

WILLIAMS, LAQUINICA BRECHEA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SQUYRES, AARON LEE

Defendant Attorney

PERDUE, ADAM F

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED

03/15/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

04/20/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

06/01/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

MOTION OTHER

06/01/2021: MOTION OTHER

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

07/15/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

07/15/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

07/28/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: 2ND CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: PERDUE, ADAM F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: PERDUE, ADAM F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Name: PERDUE, ADAM F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Name: SQUYRES, AARON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: WILLIAMS, LAQUINICA BRECHEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less