This case was last updated from Crittenden County Courts on 06/24/2022 at 10:12:03 (UTC).

EVOLVE BANK & TRUST V SHEILA K FOWLER ETAL

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 EVOLVE BANK TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SHEILA K FOWLER ETAL. This case was filed in Crittenden County Courts, Crittenden County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LUSBY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-200

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Crittenden, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

LUSBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVOLVE BANK & TRUST

Defendants

FOWLER, SHEILA K

FOWLER, JEFF

FOWLER, MELANIE

HULBERT DEVELOPMENT CO INC

FAVRE, JEFF

HULBERT MINI STORGE INC

THE UNKOWN OCCUPANTS IF ANY

FAVRE, KIM

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE AND ADMINISTRATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HURST JR , HARRY S

Defendant Attorneys

PENCE JR , RICHARD M

RILEY, ROBERT TATE

SKIPPER, TAYLOR NICOLE

 

Court Documents

ORDER DISTRIBUTION

02/16/2022: ORDER DISTRIBUTION

PETITION

02/11/2022: PETITION

ORDER DISTRIBUTION

01/05/2022: ORDER DISTRIBUTION

LETTER

12/16/2021: LETTER

EXHIBITS

12/16/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

12/16/2021: EXHIBITS

PETITION

12/16/2021: PETITION

PETITION

12/16/2021: PETITION

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

12/16/2021: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

ORDER DISTRIBUTION

12/08/2021: ORDER DISTRIBUTION

LETTER TO COURT

12/07/2021: LETTER TO COURT

ORDER DISTRIBUTION

12/03/2021: ORDER DISTRIBUTION

PETITION

12/03/2021: PETITION

ORDER OTHER

11/02/2021: ORDER OTHER

REPORT OF SALE

11/02/2021: REPORT OF SALE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

10/15/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

COMMISSIONERS SALE NOTICE

10/04/2021: COMMISSIONERS SALE NOTICE

AGREED ORDER

10/01/2021: AGREED ORDER

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER DISTRIBUTION; Name: 2ND CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: RILEY, ROBERT TATE; Entry: Petition for Subsequent Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER DISTRIBUTION; Name: 2ND CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Name: PENCE JR , RICHARD M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: PENCE JR , RICHARD M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: PENCE JR , RICHARD M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: PENCE JR , RICHARD M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: PENCE JR , RICHARD M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; Name: HURST JR , HARRY S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER DISTRIBUTION; Name: 2ND CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: HULBERT DEVELOPMENT CO INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: HULBERT MINI STORGE INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: FAVRE, JEFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: FAVRE, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: FOWLER, MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: FOWLER, JEFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: FOWLER, SHEILA K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY, ROBERT TATE