This case was last updated from Baxter County Courts on 02/12/2022 at 08:54:30 (UTC).

ESTATE OF KAREL F. SANDERS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 ESTATE OF KAREL F SANDERS -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Baxter County Courts, Baxter County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAYTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-159

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Baxter, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

LAYTON

 

Party Details

Decedent

SANDERS, KAREL F.

Not Yet Classified and Administrators

SANDERS, BRUCE

WILLETT, BILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MORGAN, ROGER L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

06/08/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

06/16/2021: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

NOTICE APPT ADMINISTRATOR/TRIX

06/24/2021: NOTICE APPT ADMINISTRATOR/TRIX

ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

06/24/2021: ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

06/24/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

08/02/2021: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

WAIVER

08/02/2021: WAIVER

ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

08/02/2021: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

FILING - OTHER

08/05/2021: FILING - OTHER

PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

08/19/2021: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

WAIVER

08/19/2021: WAIVER

ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

08/19/2021: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: MORGAN, ROGER L; Entry: WAIVER OF NOTICE AND CONSENT TO SALE REAL ESTATE (BRUCE SANDERS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP; Name: MORGAN, ROGER L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: COPY OF FIDUCIARY'S DEED FILED IN LAND RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: MORGAN, ROGER L; Entry: WAIVER AND CONSENT TO SALE OF REAL ESTATE (BRUCE SANDERS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP; Name: MORGAN, ROGER L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX; Name: MORGAN, ROGER L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE APPT ADMINISTRATOR/TRIX; Name: MORGAN, ROGER L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 03CI5569.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MORGAN, ROGER L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MORGAN, ROGER L; Entry: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: MORGAN, ROGER L

    Read MoreRead Less