This case was last updated from Baxter County Courts on 06/01/2022 at 16:13:16 (UTC).

ESTATE OF DOLLIE H. BENTON A/K/A MAE BENTON -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 ESTATE OF DOLLIE H BENTON A/K/A MAE BENTON -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Baxter County Courts, Baxter County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAYTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-177

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Baxter, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

LAYTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BENTON, BRUCE

Claimant

ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES

Decedent

BENTON, DOLLIE H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SANDERS, TED H

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

06/23/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

06/23/2021: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

06/23/2021: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

06/23/2021: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

06/24/2021: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

NOTICE APPT EXECUTOR/TRIX

06/24/2021: NOTICE APPT EXECUTOR/TRIX

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

06/24/2021: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

07/13/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

10/27/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

FILING - OTHER

01/31/2022: FILING - OTHER

INVENTORY OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE

04/06/2022: INVENTORY OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE

ACCOUNTING BY PERSONAL REP$

04/06/2022: ACCOUNTING BY PERSONAL REP$

PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

04/07/2022: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

WAIVER

04/07/2022: WAIVER

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: NO ACTION TAKEN; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: Please provide approval of the claimant or contact the TCA for a setting date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: SANDERS, TED H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: SANDERS, TED H; Entry: Waiver of Notice of Filing of and Hearing on Final Accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB; Name: SANDERS, TED H; Entry: Petition for Authority to Make Distribution and Discharge Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $55.00 was made on receipt 03CI6951.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCOUNTING BY PERSONAL REP$; Name: SANDERS, TED H; Entry: Accounting by Personal Representative or Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INVENTORY OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE; Name: SANDERS, TED H; Entry: Inventory of Estate of Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: COPY OF FIDUCIARY'S DEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$5.00 was made on receipt 03CI6218.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: DHS-DIVISION OF MEDICAL SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE APPT EXECUTOR/TRIX; Name: SANDERS, TED H; Entry: Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP; Name: SANDERS, TED H; Entry: Acceptance of Appointment as Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 03CI5633.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SANDERS, TED H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Name: SANDERS, TED H; Entry: Last Will and Testament of Dollie H. Benton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: SANDERS, TED H; Entry: Petition for Probate of Will and Appointment of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: SANDERS, TED H; Entry: Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less