This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/31/2023 at 05:04:51 (UTC).

EMILY THOMAS V MICHAEL THOMAS -BENCH TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 EMILY THOMAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MICHAEL THOMAS -BENCH TRIAL. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HANNAH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-101

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HANNAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS, EMILY

Defendant

THOMAS, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MERCER, JUSTIN GABRIEL

Defendant Attorneys

PETTY, JAMES MICHAEL

PETTY, DENNY PAUL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

02/10/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/10/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

02/10/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER

02/10/2022: STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/10/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

RETURN OF SERVICE

03/02/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

03/18/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

03/18/2022: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

ORDER TEMPORARY HEARING

05/03/2022: ORDER TEMPORARY HEARING

DECREE OF DIVORCE

07/25/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: MERCER, JUSTIN GABRIEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: NO ACTION TAKEN; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING SCHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TEMPORARY HEARING; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: TEMPORARY HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Name: PETTY, JAMES MICHAEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: MERCER, JUSTIN GABRIEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Name: MERCER, JUSTIN GABRIEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: TEMPORARY HEARING SCHEDULED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less