This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 11:19:15 (UTC).

EMILY ROACH V BRIAN ROACH -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 EMILY ROACH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRIAN ROACH -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SUTTERFIELD, DENNIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-41

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SUTTERFIELD, DENNIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROACH, EMILY

Defendant

ROACH, BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAUGHN, BRADEN R

Defendant Attorney

VEACH, ROBERT M

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS SERVED

02/22/2022: SUMMONS SERVED

ANSWER FILED

03/01/2022: ANSWER FILED

MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

04/26/2022: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AMENDED COMPLAINT

05/04/2022: AMENDED COMPLAINT

RESPONSE/REPLY

05/05/2022: RESPONSE/REPLY

ANSWER FILED

05/06/2022: ANSWER FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: VEACH, ROBERT M; Entry: ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Name: VAUGHN, BRADEN R; Entry: Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Therein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED COMPLAINT; Name: VAUGHN, BRADEN R; Entry: AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE COMPLAINT FOR SEPARATE MAINTENANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Name: VEACH, ROBERT M; Entry: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: VEACH, ROBERT M; Entry: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER; Name: VAUGHN, BRADEN R; Entry: SERVED BRIAN ROACH ON 02/22/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 58CI1951.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: VAUGHN, BRADEN R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: VAUGHN, BRADEN R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: VAUGHN, BRADEN R; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: VAUGHN, BRADEN R

    Read MoreRead Less