This case was last updated from Van Buren County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 13:12:19 (UTC).

ELIZABETH LOVELACE -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 ELIZABETH LOVELACE -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Van Buren County Courts, Van Buren County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLARK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-42

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Van Buren, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CLARK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLIAMS, DAVID RICHARD

Not Yet Classified

WILLIAMS, DAVID H

WILLIAMS, DAVID

Decedent

LOVELACE, ELIZABETH J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MORGAN, MELVIN E

Other Attorneys

BLAGG, RALPH JOHN

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT COLLECTION SM ESTAT$

05/05/2021: AFFIDAVIT COLLECTION SM ESTAT$

NOTICE - OTHER

05/07/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

AFFIDAVIT COLLECTION SM ESTATE

05/11/2021: AFFIDAVIT COLLECTION SM ESTATE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

06/09/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PETITION

01/20/2022: PETITION

PETITION

01/20/2022: PETITION

AFFIDAVIT FILED

05/05/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

NOTICE - OTHER

05/09/2022: NOTICE - OTHER

AFFIDAVIT FILED

05/05/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: BLAGG, RALPH JOHN; Entry: NOTICE OF FILING OF SMALL ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: BLAGG, RALPH JOHN; Entry: AMENDED AFFIDAVIT FOR COLLECTION OF SMALL ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: BLAGG, RALPH JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $50.00 was made on receipt 71CI3744.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF REOPEN SMALL ESTATE; Name: MORGAN, MELVIN E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE REOPENED $50; Name: MORGAN, MELVIN E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: MORGAN, MELVIN E; Entry: AMENDED AFFIDAVIT FOR COLLECTION OF SMALL ESTATE BY DISTRIBUTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET REOPEN PROBATE; Name: MORGAN, MELVIN E; Entry: COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: MORGAN, MELVIN E; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT COLLECTION SM ESTATE; Name: MORGAN, MELVIN E; Entry: Amended Affidavit for Collection of Small Estate By Distributee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: MORGAN, MELVIN E; Entry: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $25.00 was made on receipt 71CI3351.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MORGAN, MELVIN E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Name: MORGAN, MELVIN E; Entry: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: MORGAN, MELVIN E; Entry: COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT COLLECTION SM ESTAT$; Name: MORGAN, MELVIN E; Entry: AFFIDAVIT FOR COLLECTION OF SMALL ESTATE BY DISTRIBUTEE

    Read MoreRead Less