This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 13:55:24 (UTC).

ELIZABETH ESAREY V ANGELA BALDWIN -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 ELIZABETH ESAREY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ANGELA BALDWIN -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MCCAIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-547

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MCCAIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESAREY, ELIZABETH RUTH

ESAREY, ELIZABETH R

Defendant

BALDWIN, ANGELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

MOBLEY, MARK

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/27/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/28/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

11/11/2021: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

ANSWER FILED

12/09/2021: ANSWER FILED

COUNTERCLAIM

12/09/2021: COUNTERCLAIM

AFFIDAVIT FILED

12/14/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

12/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

01/11/2022: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

MOTION COMPEL DISCOVERY

03/15/2022: MOTION COMPEL DISCOVERY

ORDER ON MTN COMPEL

03/15/2022: ORDER ON MTN COMPEL

LETTER FROM COURT

03/17/2022: LETTER FROM COURT

ORDER ON MTN COMPEL

04/25/2022: ORDER ON MTN COMPEL

MOTION OTHER

05/11/2022: MOTION OTHER

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS; Entry: MOTION TO STRIKE AND OTHER RELATED MATTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON MTN COMPEL; Entry: ORDER TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER FROM COURT; Entry: LETTER TO CONFIRM DISCUSSION DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON MTN COMPEL; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION COMPEL DISCOVERY; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY AND CORROOBORATION OF GROUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS; Entry: AFFIDAVIT ORAL DISPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, ELIZABETH R ESAREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COUNTERCLAIM; Name: MOBLEY, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: MOBLEY, MARK; Entry: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS; Entry: SERVED DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 58CI1455.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: SKELTON, WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOBLEY, MARK