This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 05/15/2022 at 12:59:24 (UTC).

EDWIN JUSTICE VS JAMES BAFFORD

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 EDWIN JUSTICE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAMES BAFFORD. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****22-5

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUSTICE, EDWIN GEORGE

Defendant

BAFFORD, JAMES MAURICE

 

Court Documents

SC COMPLAINT FILED $65

01/21/2022: SC COMPLAINT FILED $65

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS SERVED

02/16/2022: SUMMONS SERVED

ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

02/18/2022: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

02/18/2022: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

TRIAL SCHEDULED

02/18/2022: TRIAL SCHEDULED

ORDER TO DISMISS

04/18/2022: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Entry: ORDER TO DISMISS SIGNED BY JUDGE SWITZER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: EVENT HELD; Entry: CASE CALLED IN OPEN COURT- JUDGE SWITZER PRESIDING- PLAINTIFF APPEARS-DEFENDANT APPEARS- TRIAL HELD- BASED ON EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY PRESENTED, COMPLAINT AND COUNTER CLAIM DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL SCHEDULED; Entry: CASE SET FOR TRIAL ON 4/11/22 AT 1:30; NOTICES MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM; Entry: DEFT MAILED IN ANSWER W/ COUNTER CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Entry: PROOF OF SERVICE BY SHERIFF OFFICE ON 1/26/22 TO JAMES BAFFORD AT 525 SECTION LINE TRL, HS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$65.00 was made on receipt 26HT194360.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: BAFFORD, JAMES MAURICE; Entry: SUMMONS BEING SERVED BY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SC COMPLAINT FILED $65; Name: JUSTICE, EDWIN GEORGE

    Read MoreRead Less