This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 01/31/2022 at 06:12:20 (UTC).

DUSTIN SALTER V NICOLE SALTER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 DUSTIN SALTER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NICOLE SALTER -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HALTOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-368

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HALTOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALTER, DUSTIN CADE

Defendant

SALTER, NICOLE LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

CONDIT, BRUCE ALAN

POTTER, JOSHUA LANDES

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/13/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/13/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE

09/17/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

09/23/2021: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

09/28/2021: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: CONDIT, BRUCE ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM; Name: POTTER, JOSHUA LANDES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: CONDIT, BRUCE ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 46CI42867.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: CONDIT, BRUCE ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: CONDIT, BRUCE ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: CONDIT, BRUCE ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: CONDIT, BRUCE ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: CONDIT, BRUCE ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less