This case was last updated from Boone County Arkansas Courts on 12/27/2022 at 14:11:54 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK V WESLEY WILSON -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WESLEY WILSON -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Boone County Arkansas Courts, Boone County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is COPELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-258

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Boone, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

COPELAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

WILSON, WESLEY F

Harrison, AR 72601-6014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE, STEPHEN L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/08/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/08/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

11/03/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/17/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

11/18/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

CERTIFICATE

11/22/2022: CERTIFICATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE; Name: BRUCE, STEPHEN L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: BRUCE, STEPHEN L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: BRUCE, STEPHEN L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 05CI4211.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: BRUCE, STEPHEN L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: BRUCE, STEPHEN L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: BRUCE, STEPHEN L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: BRUCE, STEPHEN L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less