This case was last updated from Baxter County Courts on 01/28/2022 at 18:00:10 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK V PATRICK MCCLEAN -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PATRICK MCCLEAN -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Baxter County Courts, Baxter County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BAILEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-196

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Baxter, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

MCLEAN, PATRICK M

Mountain Home, AR 72653-7824

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WITHROW, LORI ELISE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

07/12/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

07/13/2021: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

07/13/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ORDER TO DISMISS

08/18/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 03CI5912.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: PATRICK MCLEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less