This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 08/20/2021 at 08:34:45 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK V MARILYN K VIA -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARILYN K VIA -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-782

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

DENNIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

VIA, MARILYN KAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WITHROW, LORI ELISE

Defendant Attorney

HASTY, DANIELLE K

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

12/01/2020: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

12/01/2020: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ANSWER FILED

01/11/2021: ANSWER FILED

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

03/03/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/03/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

INTERROGATORIES

03/03/2021: INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

03/04/2021: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

JUDGMENT-CONSENT

03/25/2021: JUDGMENT-CONSENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED; Name: HASTY, DANIELLE K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INTERROGATORIES; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 35CI2441.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: HASTY, DANIELLE K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less