This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 05/14/2022 at 12:56:01 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK V KOBE T STORAY -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KOBE T STORAY -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-161

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

STORAY, KOBE TICON MISKELL

West Fork, AR 72774-9306

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WITHROW, LORI ELISE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/10/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

03/29/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

04/06/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE; Entry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 72CI82912.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - KOBE T STORAY 02-08-2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: KOBE T STORAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE; Entry: KOBE T STORAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE; Entry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: WITHROW, LORI ELISE

    Read MoreRead Less