This case was last updated from Baxter County Courts on 05/31/2022 at 05:39:48 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK V JEANIE C ROBERSON -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JEANIE C ROBERSON -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Baxter County Courts, Baxter County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BAILEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-172

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Baxter, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

ROBERSON, JEANIE C

Mountain Home, AR 72653

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAYS, M CLARK

LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

06/14/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/14/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

12/08/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/17/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT FILED

12/17/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

12/22/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MLILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L; Entry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (JEANIE C ROBERSON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 03CI5585.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L; Entry: JEANIE C ROBERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L; Entry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less