This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 02/10/2022 at 12:43:49 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK V JAMES F SHOFFNER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAMES F SHOFFNER -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HEARNSBERGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-466

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HEARNSBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

SHOFFNER, JAMES F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

05/20/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/20/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

07/26/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/23/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT FILED

08/23/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

08/24/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION IV,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L; Entry: JAMES SHOFFNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 26CI14671.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L; Entry: JAMES F SHOFFNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less