This case was last updated from Craighead County Courts on 07/04/2022 at 19:12:10 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK V DAVID LYNN SANDBORN -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVID LYNN SANDBORN -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Craighead County Courts, Craighead County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2-98

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Craighead, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

SANBORN, DAVID LYNN

Jonesboro, AR 72401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/20/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

05/06/2022: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

05/09/2022: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Name: 2ND CIRCUIT DIVISION 9,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 16ZS16070.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less