This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 16:27:05 (UTC).

DFA V TASHA L CLARK -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 DFA filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against TASHA L CLARK -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-41

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

DENNIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE & ADMINISTRATION

Defendant

CLARK, TASHA L

Garnishee

ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

Defendant Attorney

BURNS, THOMAS WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS

01/20/2022: REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS

WRIT OTHER ISSUED

01/20/2022: WRIT OTHER ISSUED

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

02/18/2022: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

ORDER GARNISHMENT

02/22/2022: ORDER GARNISHMENT

MOTION DISMISS

03/21/2022: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED

03/21/2022: ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL; Entry: MOTION TO DISMISS WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Name: BURNS, THOMAS WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OTHER ISSUED; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less