This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 01/29/2022 at 03:36:06 (UTC).

DFA V LAURALEA HORTON -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 DFA filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against LAURALEA HORTON -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MARC R. MCCUNE DIV 1. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-315

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MARC R. MCCUNE DIV 1

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE & ADMINISTRATION

Defendant

HORTON, LAURALEA

Garnishee

WASHINGTON REGIONAL MED CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

Garnishee Attorney

COZART, ANDREW CARTER

 

Court Documents

REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS

07/20/2021: REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

07/21/2021: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

08/16/2021: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

ORDER GARNISHMENT

08/18/2021: ORDER GARNISHMENT

MOTION DISMISS

09/08/2021: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED

09/10/2021: ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED; Name: JUDGE MARC R. MCCUNE DIV 1,; Entry: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED BY PLTF AGAINST GARNISHEE BE DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL; Entry: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED BY ATTY ANDREW IVEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GARNISHMENT; Name: JUDGE MARC R. MCCUNE DIV 1,; Entry: TO RELEASE MONIES, PLTF TO RECOVER FROM WASHINGTON REGIONAL MED CENTER A SUM EQUAL TO 25% OF THE NET DISPOSABLE INCOME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Name: COZART, ANDREW CARTER; Entry: FILED BY ATTY ANDREW COZART FOR WASHINGTON REG MED CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL; Entry: NOTICE, ALLEGATIONS, AND INTERROGARTORIES TO WASHINGTON REGIONAL MED CENTER, TO ATTY FOR SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL; Entry: CERTIFICATE OF INDEBTEDNESS, FILED BY ATTY ANDREW IVEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less