This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 01/29/2023 at 11:12:20 (UTC).

DFA V KIMBERLY HILL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 DFA filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KIMBERLY HILL -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HALTOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-437

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HALTOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE AND ADMINISTRATION

Defendant

HILL, KIMBERLY ROCHELLE

Garnishee

TYSON FOODS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

 

Court Documents

REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS

09/09/2022: REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS

WRIT OTHER ISSUED

09/09/2022: WRIT OTHER ISSUED

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

10/11/2022: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

ORDER GARNISHMENT

10/13/2022: ORDER GARNISHMENT

MOTION DISMISS

10/14/2022: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED

10/18/2022: ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED; Name: EIGHT SOUTH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL; Entry: MOTION TO DISMISS WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GARNISHMENT; Name: EIGHT SOUTH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER TO RELEASE MONIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OTHER ISSUED; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less