This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 04/05/2022 at 02:46:15 (UTC).

DFA V AUDREY HAMPTON -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 DFA filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against AUDREY HAMPTON -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HALTOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-428

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HALTOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE AND ADMINISTRATION

Defendant

HAMPTON, AUDREY MARIA

Garnishee

ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

Garnishee Attorney

STUDDARD, DAVID

 

Court Documents

REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS

10/05/2021: REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS

WRIT OTHER ISSUED

10/05/2021: WRIT OTHER ISSUED

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

10/14/2021: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

MOTION DISMISS

10/19/2021: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED

10/19/2021: ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED; Name: EIGHT SOUTH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL; Entry: Motion to Dismiss Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Name: STUDDARD, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OTHER ISSUED; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REGISTER OF JUDGMENTS; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: IVEY, ANDREW MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less