This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 05/05/2022 at 11:06:45 (UTC).

DEBRA ELLIOTT V CLAYTON HOOVER ETAL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 DEBRA ELLIOTT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CLAYTON HOOVER ETAL -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is OHM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-61

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

OHM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELLIOTT, DEBRA

Defendants

HOOVER, CLAYTON ALLEN

HOOVER, CLAYTON A

HOOVER, CLAYTON

MOND, JEFFREY

SUTTON, J C

SUTTON, JOSEPHINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS, WESLEY WOOD

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

EXHIBITS

01/21/2022: EXHIBITS

AFFIDAVIT FILED

01/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

NOTICE - OTHER

01/21/2022: NOTICE - OTHER

NOTICE - OTHER

01/21/2022: NOTICE - OTHER

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

03/15/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

EXHIBITS

03/31/2022: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

03/31/2022: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

03/31/2022: EXHIBITS

ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

04/01/2022: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: HARRIS, WESLEY WOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION I,; Entry: PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF PUBLIC SALE AND TO QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: HARRIS, WESLEY WOOD; Entry: Exhibit C - Limited Warranty Deed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: HARRIS, WESLEY WOOD; Entry: Exhibit B - Warranty Deed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: HARRIS, WESLEY WOOD; Entry: Exhibit A - Commissioner's Deed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: HARRIS, WESLEY WOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: HARRIS, WESLEY WOOD; Entry: NOTICE OF PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF PUBLIC SALE AND TO QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 26CI17119.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: HARRIS, WESLEY WOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: HARRIS, WESLEY WOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: HARRIS, WESLEY WOOD; Entry: Exhibit A - Commissioners Sale Deed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: HARRIS, WESLEY WOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: HARRIS, WESLEY WOOD

    Read MoreRead Less