This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 06/24/2022 at 17:45:01 (UTC).

DAVID JERRY MOWRY -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 DAVID JERRY MOWRY -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-513

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BRYAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAWRENCE, LORIEN

Decedent

MOWRY, DAVID JERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HUBER, KASPER F

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

05/20/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

05/20/2022: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

WAIVER

05/20/2022: WAIVER

WAIVER

05/20/2022: WAIVER

ORDER OTHER

05/23/2022: ORDER OTHER

ACCEPT APPOINTMENT

05/23/2022: ACCEPT APPOINTMENT

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

05/23/2022: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

NOTICE AFF CLAIM AGAINST ESTAT

06/08/2022: NOTICE AFF CLAIM AGAINST ESTAT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

06/21/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

06/23/2022: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: HUBER, KASPER F; Entry: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE AFF CLAIM AGAINST ESTAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPOINTMENT; Name: HUBER, KASPER F; Entry: Acceptance of Appointment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 5,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 72CO5050.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: HUBER, KASPER F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: HUBER, KASPER F; Entry: Waiver - M. Allbright

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: HUBER, KASPER F; Entry: Waiver - L. Lawrence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Name: HUBER, KASPER F; Entry: Last Will and Testament

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: HUBER, KASPER F; Entry: Petition for Probate of Will and Appointment of Executor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: HUBER, KASPER F; Entry: Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less