This case was last updated from Craighead County Courts on 07/07/2022 at 03:56:27 (UTC).

DAVID DIXSON V TAFFY DIXSON -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 DAVID DIXSON filed an Other lawsuit against TAFFY DIXSON -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Craighead County Courts, Craighead County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BIBB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2-35

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Craighead, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BIBB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIXSON, DAVID DEWAYNE

Defendant

DIXSON, TAFFY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

LILLY, MARTIN EMMETT

LILLY, MICHAEL ALAN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

SUMMONS SERVED

01/24/2022: SUMMONS SERVED

RESPONSE/REPLY

02/16/2022: RESPONSE/REPLY

COUNTERCLAIM

02/16/2022: COUNTERCLAIM

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

02/21/2022: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/08/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

TEMPORARY ORDER

06/14/2022: TEMPORARY ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: TEMPORARY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET TEXT; Entry: Hearing held 3-14-22 on Plaintiff's Petition for Visitation. APPS: Plaintiff with attorney Marty Lilly; Defendant with attorney Michael Lilly. Ruling granting father's request for visitation announced in court. Marty Lilly will submit an order for entry. MBR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Name: LILLY, MARTIN EMMETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: LILLY, MARTIN EMMETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: LILLY, MICHAEL ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: LILLY, MARTIN EMMETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Name: LILLY, MARTIN EMMETT; Entry: 2/28/22 AT 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 16ZS16073.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: LILLY, MARTIN EMMETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: LILLY, MARTIN EMMETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LILLY, MARTIN EMMETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: LILLY, MARTIN EMMETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: LILLY, MARTIN EMMETT

    Read MoreRead Less