This case was last updated from Baxter County Courts on 06/22/2022 at 02:28:26 (UTC).

DARREL KNOUSE, DECEASED -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 DARREL KNOUSE, DECEASED -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Baxter County Courts, Baxter County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAYTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-312

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Baxter, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

LAYTON

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BUSHMAN, NORMAN HENRY

BUSHMAN, NORMAN H

Decedent

KNOUSE, DARREL THEODORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

STROTHER, JODI LANE

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT FILED

05/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT

05/13/2022: CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

05/05/2022: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

ORDER OTHER

04/21/2022: ORDER OTHER

AFFIDAVIT FILED

04/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

FILING - OTHER

04/11/2022: FILING - OTHER

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

04/07/2022: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

04/07/2022: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

04/07/2022: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

04/01/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION

02/09/2022: ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION

AMENDED PETITION

01/04/2022: AMENDED PETITION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

01/03/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF FILING ACCOUNTS

11/24/2021: NOTICE OF FILING ACCOUNTS

ACCOUNTING BY PERSONAL REP$

11/24/2021: ACCOUNTING BY PERSONAL REP$

NOTICE OF FILING ACCOUNTS

11/24/2021: NOTICE OF FILING ACCOUNTS

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/29/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AMENDED PETITION

10/29/2021: AMENDED PETITION

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE; Entry: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE; Entry: RECEIPT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE; Entry: Affidavit - Norman Bushman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE; Entry: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE; Entry: DENA SPARKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE; Entry: NORMAN BUSHMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 03CI4800.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE; Entry: WAIVER OF NOTICE AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE; Entry: WAIVER OF NOTICE AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE; Entry: Petition for Probate of Will and Appointment of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: STROTHER, JODI LANE

    Read MoreRead Less