This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 11:01:02 (UTC).

DARCI BECKER V COLBIE GRIMLEY-JENKINS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 DARCI BECKER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COLBIE GRIMLEY-JENKINS -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-33

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BECKER, DARCI KATHERINE

Defendants

GRIMLEY-JENKINS, COLBIE W

GRIMLEY, JENKINS C

GRIMLEY, COLLIE W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAMBERLIN, STEPHANIE ANGEL

TAPP III , TYLAR CHARLES MARSHAL

Defendant Attorney

HEALY, FLOYD ALFORD

 

Court Documents

ORDER MOTION GRANTED

05/11/2022: ORDER MOTION GRANTED

REQUEST

05/09/2022: REQUEST

ORDER CUSTODY/VISITATION

05/02/2022: ORDER CUSTODY/VISITATION

ORDER TO WITHDRAW

05/02/2022: ORDER TO WITHDRAW

MOTION OTHER

05/02/2022: MOTION OTHER

NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

04/27/2022: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

04/22/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

MOTION CUSTODY/VISITATION

04/22/2022: MOTION CUSTODY/VISITATION

ORDER SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

04/21/2022: ORDER SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

04/21/2022: MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

04/14/2022: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

RESPONSE/REPLY

04/12/2022: RESPONSE/REPLY

ORDER MOTION DENIED

04/08/2022: ORDER MOTION DENIED

ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

03/29/2022: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

03/25/2022: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

MOTION CONTINUANCE

03/22/2022: MOTION CONTINUANCE

NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

03/07/2022: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

03/01/2022: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Room: COURTROOM 203, DIVISION III; Location: CIRCUIT; Judge: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER MOTION GRANTED; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,; Entry: ORDER GRANTING SELF REPRESENTED DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST; Entry: REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CUSTODY/VISITATION; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,; Entry: HEARING 5-20-22 EMERGENCY ORDER GRANTING IMMEDIATE TEMPORARY CUSTODY OF MINOR CHILD AND TEMPORARY EXPLUSIVE POSSESSION OF PLAITIFF'S PREMARITAL HOME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO WITHDRAW; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: HEALY, FLOYD ALFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED; Entry: 5-20-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: CHAMBERLIN, STEPHANIE ANGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION CUSTODY/VISITATION; Name: CHAMBERLIN, STEPHANIE ANGEL; Entry: EMERGENCY MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE TEMPORARY CUSTODY OF MINOR CHILD AND TEMPORARY EXCLUSIVE POSSESSION OF PLAINTIFF'S PREMARITAL HOME

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: HEALY, FLOYD ALFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: TAPP III , TYLAR CHARLES MARSHAL; Entry: COLBIE GRIMLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Name: GRIMLEY-JENKINS, COLBIE W; Entry: COLBIE GRIMLEY-JENKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Name: TAPP III , TYLAR CHARLES MARSHAL; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 26CI17117.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: TAPP III , TYLAR CHARLES MARSHAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET; Name: TAPP III , TYLAR CHARLES MARSHAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: TAPP III , TYLAR CHARLES MARSHAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: TAPP III , TYLAR CHARLES MARSHAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: TAPP III , TYLAR CHARLES MARSHAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMBERLIN, STEPHANIE ANGEL