This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 01/28/2022 at 13:59:09 (UTC).

DAISY MARIE SHACKELFORD -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 DAISY MARIE SHACKELFORD -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-629

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BRYAN

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Executor

FOSHE, KAREN MARIE

Decedent

SHACKELFORD, DAISY MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BUTT II , WILLIAM JACKSON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

07/07/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

07/07/2021: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

LETTER TO COURT

07/07/2021: LETTER TO COURT

ORDER OTHER

07/08/2021: ORDER OTHER

ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

07/08/2021: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

07/08/2021: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

MOTION OTHER

07/12/2021: MOTION OTHER

LETTER TO COURT

07/12/2021: LETTER TO COURT

ORDER OTHER

07/12/2021: ORDER OTHER

MOTION OTHER

07/13/2021: MOTION OTHER

LETTER TO COURT

07/13/2021: LETTER TO COURT

ORDER MOTION GRANTED

07/13/2021: ORDER MOTION GRANTED

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

08/02/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: BUTT II , WILLIAM JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER MOTION GRANTED; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 5,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER TO COURT; Name: BUTT II , WILLIAM JACKSON; Entry: encl proposed Order Approving Sale of RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: BUTT II , WILLIAM JACKSON; Entry: for Approval to Sell Real Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 5,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER TO COURT; Name: BUTT II , WILLIAM JACKSON; Entry: encl proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: BUTT II , WILLIAM JACKSON; Entry: to Approve Lloyd & Daisy Shackelford Estate & Trust Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP; Name: BUTT II , WILLIAM JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 5,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER TO COURT; Name: BUTT II , WILLIAM JACKSON; Entry: encl proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 72CO3768.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: BUTT II , WILLIAM JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Name: BUTT II , WILLIAM JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Name: BUTT II , WILLIAM JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: BUTT II , WILLIAM JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: BUTT II , WILLIAM JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less