This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 05/08/2022 at 12:51:34 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT V ROGER SEALS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROGER SEALS -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1017

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

SEALS, ROGER ALAN

SEALS, ROGER

Hot Springs National Park, AR 71901

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER, RONALD C

Defendant Attorney

DUSSEX, ELIZABETH NOEL

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

10/28/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

AFFIDAVIT FILED

10/28/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

10/28/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ANSWER FILED

11/29/2021: ANSWER FILED

TRIAL SCHEDULED

11/30/2021: TRIAL SCHEDULED

SUMMONS SERVED

12/06/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

CERTIFICATE

12/13/2021: CERTIFICATE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/13/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

AMENDED ANSWER

12/13/2021: AMENDED ANSWER

JUDGMENT-CONSENT

12/23/2021: JUDGMENT-CONSENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$10.00 was made on receipt 26HT194056.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: APPEAL TRANSCRIPT/CERT COPY; Entry: CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT REQUESTED BY ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL CANCELLED; Entry: TRIAL CANCELLED-- CONSENT JUDGMENT SIGNED 12/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-CONSENT; Name: DISTRICT JUDGE OF GARLAND COUNTY,; Entry: CONSENT JUDGMENT SIGNED BY JUDGE GRAHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED ANSWER; Name: DUSSEX, ELIZABETH NOEL; Entry: AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY ATTY DUSSEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Name: MILLER, RONALD C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE; Name: MILLER, RONALD C; Entry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED BY ATTY MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: MILLER, RONALD C; Entry: PROOF OF SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER ON 11/13/21 TO ROGER SEALS FILED BY ATTY MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL SCHEDULED; Entry: CASE SET FOR TRIAL ON 2/7/22 AT 1:30; NOTICES MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: DUSSEX, ELIZABETH NOEL; Entry: ANSWER DENYING CLAIM FILED B Y ATTY DUSSEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $82.50 was made on receipt 26HT189927.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE DISTRICT 16-17-126; Name: MILLER, RONALD C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: MILLER, RONALD C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: MILLER, RONALD C

    Read MoreRead Less