This case was last updated from Crittenden County Courts on 06/29/2022 at 16:19:35 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION V ROSIE WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROSIE WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Crittenden County Courts, Crittenden County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LUSBY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-342

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Crittenden, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

LUSBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

WILLIAMS, ROSIE LEE

West Memphis, AR 72301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCHUGHES, BECKY A

LOGAN, JOSH

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED

05/12/2022: CV COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/12/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE

06/06/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

06/13/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

06/24/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: WILLIAMS, ROSIE LEE; Entry: 6-3-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: WILLIAMS, ROSIE LEE; Entry: 6-3-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: WILLIAMS, ROSIE LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOGAN, JOSH