This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 02/12/2023 at 17:28:46 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION V LANGBON ETAL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LANGBON ETAL -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2370

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

RIKLON, ALINSON

Springdale, AR 72764

LANGBON, RUTHANN

Springdale, AR 72764

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCHUGHES, BECKY A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/15/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/15/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/15/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS SERVED

10/26/2022: SUMMONS SERVED

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

01/12/2023: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

01/20/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

01/24/2023: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

02/09/2023: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A; Entry: RUTHANN LANGBON 10/1/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE; Entry: 3-2-23 @ 1:15 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A; Entry: ALINSON RIKLON 10/1/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $170.00 was made on receipt 04CI82403.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A; Entry: ALINSON RIKLON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A; Entry: RUTHANN LANGBON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR DEFAULT ON CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less