This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 02/28/2022 at 05:50:34 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP V TONYA POTTHAST -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TONYA POTTHAST -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE MEDLOCK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-318

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE MEDLOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

POTTHAST, TONYA

Mountainburg, AR 72946-3056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCHUGHES, BECKY A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

07/21/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/21/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

08/03/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ORDER TO DISMISS

09/13/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: JUDGE MIKE MEDLOCK,; Entry: WITH PREJUDICE IN THAT THE CLAIM IN QUESTION HAS BEEN SETTLED IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A; Entry: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT TO TONYA POTTHAST ON 07/23/2021 BY PROCESS SERVER BRUCE FIMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 17CI16635.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A; Entry: TO DEFT TO ATTY FOR SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A; Entry: FILED BY ATTY/JOSH LOGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less