This case was last updated from Saline County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 06:37:22 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP V ARIEL COMPTON ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARIEL COMPTON. This case was filed in Saline County Courts, Saline County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is FARMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-82

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Saline, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

FARMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

RICHARDSON, SHERRI Y

Sherrill, AR 72152

CROMPTON, ARIEL MONEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOGAN, JOSH

MCHUGHES, BECKY A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

01/21/2022: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

BANKRUPTCY NOTICE FILED

04/02/2022: BANKRUPTCY NOTICE FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BANKRUPTCY NOTICE FILED; Entry: SHERRI RICHARDSON ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Entry: SHERRI RICHARDSON SERVED 2/11/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: TWO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOGAN, JOSH