This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 05/01/2022 at 03:47:09 (UTC).

CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC V JERMAINE JACKSON -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC filed an Other lawsuit against JERMAINE JACKSON -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WYATT, ROBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-99

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WYATT, ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC

Defendant

JERMAINE, JACKSON

Garnishee

TURNER HOLDINGS, LLC DBA TURNER DAIRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, JONATHAN BRADLEY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

02/12/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

02/12/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

03/24/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

05/04/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

BRIEF IN SUPPORT

05/04/2021: BRIEF IN SUPPORT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

05/06/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

INTERROGATORIES

09/30/2021: INTERROGATORIES

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

10/01/2021: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

11/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

11/30/2021: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

ORDER OTHER

12/02/2021: ORDER OTHER

MOTION DISMISS

01/31/2022: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED

01/31/2022: ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED; Name: 11TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: MOORE, JONATHAN BRADLEY; Entry: MOTION TO DISMISS GARNISHMENT AND RELEASE GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 11TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER TO PAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Name: MOORE, JONATHAN BRADLEY; Entry: GARNISHEE: PRAIRIE FARMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MOORE, JONATHAN BRADLEY; Entry: TURNER HOLDINGS, LLC SERVED ON 11/15/2021 VIA CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $20.00 was made on receipt 35CI4250.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Name: MOORE, JONATHAN BRADLEY; Entry: GARNISHEE: TURNER HOLDINGS, LLC d/b/a TURNER DAIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INTERROGATORIES; Name: MOORE, JONATHAN BRADLEY; Entry: GARNISHMENT ALLEGATIONS AND INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: MOORE, JONATHAN BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BRIEF IN SUPPORT; Name: MOORE, JONATHAN BRADLEY; Entry: of Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: MOORE, JONATHAN BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MOORE, JONATHAN BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 35CI2556.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MOORE, JONATHAN BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MOORE, JONATHAN BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MOORE, JONATHAN BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: MOORE, JONATHAN BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less