This case was last updated from Crittenden County Courts on 05/31/2022 at 07:46:18 (UTC).

CONN APPLIANCES INC V NELLIE TERRELL

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 CONN APPLIANCES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NELLIE TERRELL. This case was filed in Crittenden County Courts, Crittenden County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELLINGTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-683

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Crittenden, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

ELLINGTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONN APPLIANCES INC

Defendant

TERRELL, NELLIE L

West Memphis, AR 72301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVE, PAUL D

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED

11/12/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS - SHERIFF

11/24/2021: SUMMONS - SHERIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

12/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

02/02/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

02/03/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: LOVE, PAUL D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: LOVE, PAUL D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Entry: SERVED NELLIE TERRELL 11/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - SHERIFF; Name: TERRELL, NELLIE L; Entry: 11-23-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: TERRELL, NELLIE L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less