This case was last updated from White County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 09:07:09 (UTC).

CNH INDUSTRIAL V KYLE LANGSTON

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 CNH INDUSTRIAL filed an Other lawsuit against KYLE LANGSTON. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BROCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-45

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BROCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CNH INDUSTRIAL

Defendant

LANGSTON, KYLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUZBEE, JOHN B.

Defendant Attorney

CHOATE, PENNY COLLINS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

OBJECTION

02/09/2022: OBJECTION

RETURN OF SERVICE

02/15/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

02/15/2022: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

ANSWER FILED

02/17/2022: ANSWER FILED

ORDER OTHER

02/28/2022: ORDER OTHER

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

03/11/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/24/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

04/20/2022: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

SUBPOENA NON-EST

04/21/2022: SUBPOENA NON-EST

ORDER OTHER

04/22/2022: ORDER OTHER

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSIONS

04/22/2022: RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSIONS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Room: WILBUR D MILLS BLDG COURTROOM; Location: CIRCUIT; Judge: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Room: WILBUR D MILLS BLDG COURTROOM; Location: CIRCUIT; Judge: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSIONS; Name: CHOATE, PENNY COLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER SETTING MOTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUBPOENA NON-EST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED; Entry: Trial Setting Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Name: BUZBEE, JOHN B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOTION HEARING CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: CHOATE, PENNY COLLINS; Entry: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED; Entry: Trial Setting Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: CHOATE, PENNY COLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: OBJECTION; Entry: Objection to Writ of Replevin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less