This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 09:54:33 (UTC).

CLAIRE GENNIN V FRANKLIN GENNIN -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 CLAIRE GENNIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FRANKLIN GENNIN -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judges overseeing this case are BEAUMONT and THREET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-101

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judges

BEAUMONT

THREET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GENNIN, CLAIRE RANAE

Defendant

GENNIN, FRANKLIN ANDREW,II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS

Defendant Attorney

PLATT, KATHRYN ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/21/2022: AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER TRANSFER

01/27/2022: ORDER TRANSFER

AFFIDAVIT FILED

03/02/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

SUMMONS SERVED

03/18/2022: SUMMONS SERVED

ANSWER FILED

03/25/2022: ANSWER FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: PLATT, KATHRYN ELIZABETH; Entry: ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS; Entry: FRANKLIN GENNIN 3/16/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS; Entry: AFF OF DUE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSFER; Entry: TRANSFERRED TO JUDGE THREET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED COMPLAINT; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS; Entry: AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 72CI81663.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS; Entry: FRANKLIN GENNINN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: SMITH, SCOTT ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less