This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 01/24/2023 at 09:34:21 (UTC).

CITY OF ROGERS AR V STRATA TRUST COMPANY -JURY TRIAL

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 CITY OF ROGERS AR filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against STRATA TRUST COMPANY -JURY TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHRANTZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1084

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SCHRANTZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF ROGERS ARKANSAS

Defendant

STRATA TRUST COMPANY AS CUSTODIAM FOR THE CAROLYN J SCHWYART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PESEK, JOHN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

MOSTYN, JOSHUA G. Q.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

04/26/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

04/26/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

04/26/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

04/26/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/26/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER OTHER

04/28/2022: ORDER OTHER

FILING - OTHER

05/09/2022: FILING - OTHER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/10/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/10/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ANSWER FILED

06/29/2022: ANSWER FILED

 

Docket Entries

06/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: MOSTYN, JOSHUA G. Q.; Entry: DEF ANSWER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: PESEK, JOHN MICHAEL; Entry: STRATA TRUST COMPANY 04/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: RECEIPT# 0903548

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 6,; Entry: ORDER OF TAKING AND POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022

DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 04CI78632.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022

DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: PESEK, JOHN MICHAEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022

DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: PESEK, JOHN MICHAEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: PESEK, JOHN MICHAEL; Entry: STRATA TRUST COMPANY AS CUSTODIAN FOR THE CAROLYN J SCHWYART ROTH IRA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: PESEK, JOHN MICHAEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022

DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: PESEK, JOHN MICHAEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less