This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 07/22/2022 at 18:49:02 (UTC).

CITY OF HOT SPRINGS V OCCUPANTS OF 119 KERRY LANE -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 CITY OF HOT SPRINGS filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against OCCUPANTS OF 119 KERRY LANE -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-520

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Hot Springs

Defendant

OWNERS/OCCUPANTS OF 119 KERRY LANE, HOT SPRINGS, AR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASKEW, TERRY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

05/23/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

05/23/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

TEMPORARY ORDER

05/23/2022: TEMPORARY ORDER

ORDER TEMPORARY HEARING

05/23/2022: ORDER TEMPORARY HEARING

SUMMONS SERVED

05/25/2022: SUMMONS SERVED

JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER

05/31/2022: JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: OTHER HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: ASKEW, TERRY; Entry: DEFENDANT SERVED 05/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TEMPORARY HEARING; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,; Entry: ORDER TEMPORARY HEARING TUESDAY, MAY 31ST, 2022 AT 1:30 P.M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: TEMPORARY ORDER; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,; Entry: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: OTHER HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: KELLY JONATHAN HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 26CI18599.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASKEW, TERRY