This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 08/03/2022 at 19:03:25 (UTC).

CITY OF HOT SPRINGS V OCCUPANTS OF 107 BOAZ STREET -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 CITY OF HOT SPRINGS filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against OCCUPANTS OF 107 BOAZ STREET -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-613

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Hot Springs

Defendants

OWNERS/OCCUPANTS OF 107 BOAZ STREET, HOT SPRINGS, AR

GILLHAM, C W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASKEW, TERRY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

06/15/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

06/15/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ORDER ON MTN TEMP RELIEF

06/15/2022: ORDER ON MTN TEMP RELIEF

ORDER REVIEW HEARING

06/15/2022: ORDER REVIEW HEARING

SUMMONS SERVED

06/17/2022: SUMMONS SERVED

JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER

06/23/2022: JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: OTHER HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: ASKEW, TERRY; Entry: DEFENDANT SERVED 06/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: OTHER HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER REVIEW HEARING; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,; Entry: ORDER FOR HEARING MONDAY JUNE 27, 2022 AT 11:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON MTN TEMP RELIEF; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,; Entry: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Name: GILLHAM, C W; Entry: C W SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Name: City of Hot Springs,; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 26CI18761.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASKEW, TERRY