This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 09/04/2022 at 19:11:29 (UTC).

CITY HS V OWNERS/OCC OF 314 MASON ST HS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 CITY HS filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against OWNERS/OCC OF 314 MASON ST HS -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-699

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Hot Springs

Defendants

NORTH ROSS MADDOX ENTERPRISES, LLC

OWNERS/OCCUPANTS OF 314 MASON STREET, HOT SPRINGS, AR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASKEW, TERRY

Defendant Attorney

KELSAY, RONALD D

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

07/08/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

07/08/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ORDER RESTRAINING WITH HEARING

07/08/2022: ORDER RESTRAINING WITH HEARING

ORDER OTHER

07/08/2022: ORDER OTHER

RETURN OF SERVICE

07/12/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

SUMMONS SERVED

07/12/2022: SUMMONS SERVED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

07/14/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

MOTION CONTINUANCE

07/14/2022: MOTION CONTINUANCE

ANSWER FILED

07/15/2022: ANSWER FILED

ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

07/15/2022: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: KELSAY, RONALD D; Entry: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND ORDER OF ABATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: OTHER HEARING CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION CONTINUANCE; Name: KELSAY, RONALD D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Name: KELSAY, RONALD D; Entry: Entry of Appearance by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: ASKEW, TERRY; Entry: DEFENDANT SERVED 07/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: ASKEW, TERRY; Entry: DEFENDANT SERVED 07/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,; Entry: TEMPORARY RESTRAINNG ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER RESTRAINING WITH HEARING; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION III,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: OTHER HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: OWNERS/OCCUPANTS OF 314 MASON ST HOT SPRINGS AR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 26CI19047.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASKEW, TERRY