This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 08:15:34 (UTC).

CITY HOT SPRINGS V CERTAIN LANDS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 CITY HOT SPRINGS filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against CERTAIN LANDS -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HEARNSBERGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-313

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HEARNSBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Hot Springs

Defendants

ADAMS, GARY RUBEN,II

ADAMS, GARY RUBEN

OWNERS/OCCUPANTS OF 507 TRIVISTA RIGHT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASKEW, TERRY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

04/07/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

04/08/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ORDER RESTRAINING WITH HEARING

04/12/2021: ORDER RESTRAINING WITH HEARING

STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER

04/12/2021: STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER

SUMMONS SERVED

04/15/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER OTHER

04/19/2021: ORDER OTHER

ORDER OTHER

06/21/2021: ORDER OTHER

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION IV,; Entry: ORDER OF ABATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: FINAL HEARING HELD; Entry: ASKEW FOR CITY OF HOT SPRINGS. GARY ADAMS, LAND OWNER DOES NOT APPEAR. HEARING HELD. GRANTED. ORDER TO FOLLOW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION IV,; Entry: ORDER AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: FINAL HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: OTHER HEARING HELD; Entry: ASKEW FOR CITY OF HOT SPRINGS. DEFENDANT, GARY ADAMS, DOES NOT APPEAR AFTER PROPER SERVICE. TEMPORARY HEARING HELD. TEMPORARY ORDER GRANTED. ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED. FINAL HEARING SET 6-9-21 AT 9:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: OTHER HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION IV,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER RESTRAINING WITH HEARING; Name: 18TH EAST CIRCUIT DIVISION IV,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: GARY ADAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 26CI14199.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: ASKEW, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASKEW, TERRY