This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 06/10/2022 at 12:57:05 (UTC).

CITIBANK, NA V JEANIE L KNIPPER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 CITIBANK, NA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JEANIE L KNIPPER -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HALTOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-41

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HALTOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N A

Defendants

KNIPPER, JEANIE LYNN

Texarkana, AR 71854

SREBALUS, JEANIE LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/20/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

03/02/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DISMISS

04/12/2022: MOTION DISMISS

JUDGMENT-DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE

04/18/2022: JUDGMENT-DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE; Name: EIGHT SOUTH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 46CI44485.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: LOVELACE, HAYDEN L

    Read MoreRead Less