This case was last updated from Crittenden County Courts on 04/11/2022 at 12:44:01 (UTC).

CHIQUITA MACK V WARREN ANDREW LAMBERT GREGORY PRES

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 CHIQUITA MACK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WARREN ANDREW LAMBERT GREGORY PRES. This case was filed in Crittenden County Courts, Crittenden County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELLINGTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-296

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Crittenden, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

ELLINGTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MACK, CHIQUITA RENE

MACK, CHIQUITA R

Defendants

PRESTAGE 3, GREGORY

LAMBERT, WARREN ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PICKFORD, SHALONDRA LEQUETTE

Defendant Attorneys

MULLALLY, MICHAEL EARL

TURNER, ANDY LEE

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED

05/17/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/17/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/17/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS SERVED

06/01/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

ANSWER FILED

06/17/2021: ANSWER FILED

ANSWER FILED

06/21/2021: ANSWER FILED

CERTIFICATE

06/21/2021: CERTIFICATE

CERTIFICATE

11/08/2021: CERTIFICATE

MOTION COMPEL DISCOVERY

11/23/2021: MOTION COMPEL DISCOVERY

BRIEF IN SUPPORT

11/23/2021: BRIEF IN SUPPORT

LETTER TO COURT

12/03/2021: LETTER TO COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER TO COURT; Name: TURNER, ANDY LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BRIEF IN SUPPORT; Name: TURNER, ANDY LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION COMPEL DISCOVERY; Name: TURNER, ANDY LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE; Name: MULLALLY, MICHAEL EARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE; Name: MULLALLY, MICHAEL EARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: MULLALLY, MICHAEL EARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: TURNER, ANDY LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: LAMBERT, WARREN ANDREW; Entry: 5-29-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: PRESTAGE 3, GREGORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: LAMBERT, WARREN ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less