This case was last updated from Pope County Courts on 01/10/2023 at 11:07:06 (UTC).

CHARLES M. EHEMANN

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 CHARLES M EHEMANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pope County Courts, Pope County District Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MCCAIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-194

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pope, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MCCAIN

 

Party Details

Petitioners

EHEMANN, KATHERINE RENEE

EHEMANN, KATHERINE R

Not Yet Classified

EHEMANN, CHRISTINA MARIE

EGENANN, CHRISTINA

EHEMANN, CHRISTINA M

EHEMANN, TINA

EHEMANN, MICHAEL A.

EHEMANN, RAYMOND KEITH

EHEMANN, ANTHONY C.

DUVALL, MARY L

Decedents

EHEMANN, CHARLES MICHAEL

EHEMANN, CHARLES M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EDDY, PAUL ANDREW

 

Court Documents

PET PROBATE WILL-APPT PERS REP

06/29/2022: PET PROBATE WILL-APPT PERS REP

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

06/29/2022: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

07/01/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

LETTER

07/01/2022: LETTER

ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

07/12/2022: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

07/12/2022: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

07/13/2022: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

CERTIFICATE

07/20/2022: CERTIFICATE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

07/28/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

WAIVER

08/14/2022: WAIVER

RECEIPT FOR CASE FILE

08/18/2022: RECEIPT FOR CASE FILE

WAIVER

09/20/2022: WAIVER

WAIVER

09/20/2022: WAIVER

WAIVER

10/18/2022: WAIVER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/24/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

10/26/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

LETTER

10/26/2022: LETTER

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Entry: LETTER TO ADMINISTRATOR REGARDING CLAIM WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED HERETO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT TO CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE FILED BY FORTE, LLC, ON BEHALF OF CAPITAL ONE, N.A., CAPITAL ONE WALMART REWARDS CARD IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,328.27.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE VIA CERTIFIED MAIL TO LOWES, CAPITAL ONE, AND PRIORITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: WAIVER SIGNED BY MARY L. DUVALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: WAIVER SIGNED BY ANTHONY C. EHEMANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: WAIVER SIGNED BY MICHAEL A. EHEMANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT FOR CASE FILE; Entry: RECEIPT AND RELEASE OF CLAIM FILED BY THE POPE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: WAIVER SIGNED BY RAYMOND KEITH EHEMANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE; Entry: CERTIFICATE OF PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Name: EHEMANN, KATHERINE RENEE; Entry: LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY ISSUED TO KATHERINE R. EHEMANN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: ACCEPTANCE OF APPOINTMENT AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SIGNED BY KATHERINE R. EHEMANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Name: 5TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,; Entry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE TO KATHERINE R. EHEMANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER; Entry: LETTER TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CLAIM WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED HERETO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT TO CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE FILED BY THE POPE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR IN THE AMOUNT OF $228.24.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Entry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF CHARLES EHEMANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET PROBATE WILL-APPT PERS REP; Name: EHEMANN, KATHERINE RENEE; Entry: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF CHARLES M. EHEMANN, DECEASED, FILED BY KATHERINE R. EHEMANN, PETITIONER AND DAUGHTER OF THE DECEDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: EDDY, PAUL ANDREW; Entry: ATTORNEY OF RECORD: PAUL EDDY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less