This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/21/2023 at 03:37:05 (UTC).

CELESTE THOMAS V MICHAEL THOMAS

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 CELESTE THOMAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MICHAEL THOMAS. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HANNAH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-106

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HANNAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS, CELESTE

Defendant

THOMAS, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAULEY, RILEY SHERIDAN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

02/11/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

PETITION

02/11/2022: PETITION

AFFIDAVIT FILED

02/11/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

02/11/2022: ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

02/11/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/17/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

DEPOSITION

04/27/2022: DEPOSITION

DEPOSITION

04/27/2022: DEPOSITION

DECREE OF DIVORCE

04/27/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 3,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: CAULEY, RILEY SHERIDAN; Entry: Deposition of Witness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: CAULEY, RILEY SHERIDAN; Entry: Deposition of Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: CAULEY, RILEY SHERIDAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Entry: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Entry: PETITION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less