This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/21/2023 at 04:52:07 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV V WILLIAM PURSELL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 CAVALRY SPV filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILLIAM PURSELL. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BROCK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-122

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BROCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

PURSELL, WILLIAM

Beebe, AR 72012-3863

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

02/14/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/14/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

03/14/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

NOTICE - OTHER

03/21/2022: NOTICE - OTHER

MOTION DISMISS

04/04/2022: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

04/04/2022: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 17TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT; Entry: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL W/O PREJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less