This case was last updated from Saline County Courts on 02/10/2022 at 17:17:57 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV LLC V DANIEL B AGBORSANGAYA -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 CAVALRY SPV LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DANIEL B AGBORSANGAYA -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Saline County Courts, Saline County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is FARMER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-447

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Saline, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

FARMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

AGBORSANGAYA, DANIEL

Benton, AR 72015-4087

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

WOODFORD, W ANDERSON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

05/27/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

05/27/2021: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/27/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

06/08/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DISMISS

08/24/2021: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

08/30/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Name: CAVALRY SPV I LLC,; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 22ND CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: WOODFORD, W ANDERSON; Entry: DANIEL B AGBORSANGAYA 06/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AO18 NOTICE / DISTRICT JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: CAVALRY SPV I LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE RENZO, JOSHUA ALBERT