This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 15:18:58 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC V MICHAEL W INGRAM -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL W INGRAM -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-570

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

DENNIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

INGRAM, MICHAEL WAYNE

White Hall, AR 71602-9594

Garnishee

FAMILY DOLLAR STORES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCHUGHES, BECKY A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/20/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/20/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/08/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/19/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

12/06/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

INTERROGATORIES

02/21/2022: INTERROGATORIES

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

02/22/2022: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $20.00 was made on receipt 35CI5044.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INTERROGATORIES; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A; Entry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITH AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A; Entry: SERVED ON 9/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 35CI4107.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: MCHUGHES, BECKY A

    Read MoreRead Less